Gulf Services Contracting, Inc. v. WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gulf Services Contracting, Inc.
Defendant: Love Funding Corporation, WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc. doing business as WDG Construction Group, MAL, L.P. and The Guaranty Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00151
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc.. (wcl, )
March 16, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #11 ANSWER - Attorney John Curtis Deshazo for WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gulf Services Contracting, Inc.. (Daniels, Charles)
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc. Consent to Removal (Dickens, Joel)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc.. (Dickens, Joel)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint, by WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc..(Dickens, Joel)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gulf Services Contracting, Inc.. Love Funding Corporation waiver sent on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Daniels, Charles)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card for WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc. served on 1/19/2021. (Daniels, Charles)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint, by MAL, L.P..(McCorkle, Walter)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Enlargement of Time for Dft to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/24/2021. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Complaint by MAL, L.P.. (McCorkle, Walter)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Gulf Services Contracting, Inc.. (wcl, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for MAL, L.P.. (wcl, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing by MAL, L.P. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Filing to State Court)(wcl, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by MAL, L.P.. (wcl, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MAL, L.P. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-CV-2021-900052.00. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602061711) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 - State Court Record, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Filing to State Court, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Receipt)(wcl, )
February 19, 2021 COMPLAINT against Love Funding Corporation, MAL, L.P., The Guaranty Company of North America, WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc., filed by Gulf Services Contracting, Inc.. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for pdf) (wcl, )
February 19, 2021 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by MAL, L.P. re: filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -8 for pdf)(wcl, )
February 19, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gulf Services Contracting, Inc.. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for pdf) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulf Services Contracting, Inc. v. WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc. doing business as WDG Construction Group
Represented By: Joel Scott Dickens
Represented By: John Curtis Deshazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAL, L.P.
Represented By: Walter Joseph McCorkle, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Alan Burkhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guaranty Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf Services Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Charles William Daniels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?