Burroughs v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie D. Burroughs
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00159
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 ***Attorney Mark Edward Chavez added Pro Hac Vice for Ronnie D. Burroughs. (dmn, ) (see Doc. #31 for pdf)
March 31, 2021 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 3/31/2021 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Katie Silas. Recording time 11:00-11:03) (dh)
March 31, 2021 Filing 31 Motion for Mark Edward Chavez to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronnie D. Burroughs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Certificate of Good Standing)(Freese, Richard) Modified on 4/2/2021 to include attorney name. (dmn, )
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #22 and #23 Motions for Brandee J. Kowalzyk and Taylor T. Daly Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/29/2021. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 29 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received for Brandee J. Kowalzyk re #22 Motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 46020627380. (dmn, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 28 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received for Taylor T. Daly re #23 Motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602062734. (dmn, )
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for David P. Matthews to appear pro hac vice (Doc. #24 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/25/2021. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
March 23, 2021 Filing 26 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received for David P. Matthews re #24 Motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602062701. (dmn, )
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #21 Joint Motion to Stay; all pending deadlines in this case are STAYED for 120 days. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court on or before 7/23/2021, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/23/2021. (cwl, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 24 Motion for David P. Matthews to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronnie D. Burroughs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, List of Court Admissions, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, Certificate of Good Standing)(Freese, Richard) Modified on 3/22/2021 to include attorney name. (dmn, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 23 Motion for Taylor T. Daly, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly)(Morris, George) Modified on 3/22/2021 to include attorney name. (dmn, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 22 Motion for Brandee J. Kowalzyk, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George) Modified on 3/24/2021 to include attorney name. (dmn, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 21 Joint NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT and MOTION to Stay by C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, Ronnie D. Burroughs (with Proposed Order). (Daly, Taylor) Modified on 3/22/2021 to include additional filers. (dmn, )
March 17, 2021 ***Attorney Taylor Tapley Daly, Brandee J. Kowalzyk added for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated; Brandee J. Kowalzyk added for C R Bard Incorporated. (dmn, ) (see Doc. #20 for pdf)
March 17, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Maughan, Diane)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by James R. Condo, Amanda Sheridan, and Snell & Wilmer LLP (Doc. #18 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/12/2021. (dmn, ) (no pdf) (dmn, ). Modified on 3/12/2021 to reflect no pdf attached; failed to add document number during docketing. (dmn, )
March 12, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re #19 TEXT ORDER on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The referenced docket text was modified to include a document number which was erroneously omitted due to docket error. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
March 12, 2021 *** Attorney James R. Condo and Amanda Sheridan terminated pursuant to #19 Text Order. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
March 11, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw James R. Condo, the law firm of Snell & Wilmer LLP, and Amanda Sheridan as Counsel for Defendants, by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Defendants will also be represented by Taylor Tapley Daly and Brandee J. Kowalzyk of the Nelson Mullins firm in Atlanta, GA. (Maughan, Diane) Modified on 3/12/2021 to clean up text, include additional attorney text, and reflect actual title. (dmn, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 17 SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency re Pro Hac Vice Admission to Attorney James R. Condo. (dmn, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 16 SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency re Pro Hac Vice Admission sent to Attorney Amanda Sheridan. (dmn, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency re Pro Hac Vice Admission to Attorney David P. Matthews. (dmn, ) Modified on 3/11/2021 to correct attorney name in docket text. (dmn, )
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: A Telephone Hearing is hereby set for 3/31/2021 at 11:00 AM before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr. Counsel shall contact chambers for the call-in number. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/11/2021. Furnished calendar, DH. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
March 11, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re #15 Second Notice of Deficiency. The referenced docket text was corrected to reflect notice sent to Attorney David P. Matthews. The wrong attorney name was originally included. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Richard B. North, Jr. (Doc. #12 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/10/2021. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
March 10, 2021 *** Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated pursuant to 13 Text Order. (dmn, )
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
February 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by George LaFayette Morris, IV on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Babb Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Case Number 2:19-cv-00459-DGC. Docket sheet and Certified copies of MDL transfer order, MDL docket sheet, and MDL case documents received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from AZD Clerk. (Attachments: #1 AZ MDL Docket 2:15md2641-DGC, #2 Case Mgt Order No. 47, #3 DKT 000248, #4 DKT 000249, #5 DKT 000269, #6 DKT 000303, #7 DKT 000314, #8 DKT 000363, #9 DKT 000364, #10 DKT 000365, #11 DKT 000366, #12 DKT 000372, #13 DKT 000401, #14 DKT 000519, #15 DKT 000699, #16 DKT 000927, #17 DKT 001108, #18 DKT 001153-1, #19 DKT 001153-2, #20 DKT 001259, #21 DKT 001319, #22 DKT 001485, #23 DKT 001662, #24 DKT 001663, #25 DKT 002238, #26 DKT 002239, #27 DKT 002813, #28 DKT 003214, #29 DKT 003215, #30 DKT 003272, #31 DKT 003398, #32 DKT 003685, #33 DKT 004015, #34 DKT 004016, #35 DKT 004141, #36 DKT 004311, #37 DKT 004335, #38 DKT 004339, #39 DKT 004865, #40 DKT 004866, #41 DKT 005007, #42 DKT 005285, #43 DKT 005770, #44 DKT 005881, #45 DKT 005883, #46 DKT 006227, #47 DKT 006799, #48 DKT 008113, #49 DKT 008315, #50 DKT 008871, #51 DKT 008872, #52 DKT 008874, #53 DKT 009415, #54 DKT 009428, #55 DKT 009432, #56 DKT 009433, #57 DKT 009434, #58 DKT 009770, #59 DKT 009771, #60 DKT 009772, #61 DKT 009773, #62 DKT 009775, #63 DKT 009861, #64 DKT 009881, #65 DKT 009991, #66 DKT 010051, #67 DKT 010052, #68 DKT 010072, #69 DKT 010075, #70 DKT 010230, #71 DKT 010231, #72 DKT 010235, #73 DKT 010258, #74 DKT 010323, #75 DKT 010348, #76 DKT 010382, #77 DKT 010403, #78 DKT 010404, #79 DKT 010438, #80 DKT 010486, #81 DKT 010489, #82 DKT 010497, #83 DKT 010524, #84 DKT 010587, #85 DKT 010819, #86 DKT 010920, #87 DKT 010922, #88 DKT 010947, #89 DKT 011011, #90 DKT 011041, #91 DKT 011064, #92 DKT 011073, #93 DKT 011080, #94 DKT 011082, #95 DKT 011256, #96 DKT 011313, #97 DKT 011320, #98 DKT 011321, #99 DKT 011659, #100 DKT 011871, #101 DKT 012007, #102 DKT 012061, #103 DKT 012202, #104 DKT 012357, #105 DKT 012507, #106 DKT 012508, #107 DKT 012533, #108 DKT 012589, #109 DKT 012590, #110 DKT 012593, #111 DKT 012595, #112 DKT 012598, #113 DKT 012830, #114 DKT 012853, #115 DKT 012971, #116 DKT 013329, #117 DKT 015098, #118 DKT 015176, #119 DKT 016343, #120 DKT 016992, #121 DKT 017008, #122 DKT 017285, #123 DKT 017386, #124 DKT 017401, #125 DKT 017494, #126 DKT 017513, #127 DKT 017582, #128 DKT 018038)(djy, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2021 to attach erroneously omitted attachments: #129 DKT 003312, #130 DKT 003313, #131 DKT 003314, #132 DKT 003372) (djy, ).
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00459. Case electronically transferred via CM/ECF; transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Middle District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/24/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/24/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 2/24/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/24/2021.]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 20896 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/18/19. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 2/24/2021.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-00459-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 2/24/2021.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16468003 filed by Ronnie D Burroughs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 2/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burroughs v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: James R. Condo
Represented By: Amanda Sheridan
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris, IV
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: James R. Condo
Represented By: Amanda Sheridan
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris, IV
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie D. Burroughs
Represented By: David P. Matthews
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Mark Edward Chavez
Represented By: Richard Arthur Freese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?