Riley et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Terry Riley and Jill Riley
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00161
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: the motions for Taylor T. Daly and Steven S. Schulte to appear pro hac vice (Docs. #16 , #19 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/31/2021. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 3/31/2021 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Katie Silas. Recording time 11:04-11:05) (dh)
March 30, 2021 Filing 22 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re #19 motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602062793. (wcl, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 21 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re #16 motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602062800. (wcl, )
March 26, 2021 Filing 19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Steven S. Schulte by Jill Riley, Terry Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Schulte, Steven) Modified on 3/30/2021 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: the #15 motion for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to appear pro hac vice is granted. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/25/2021. (No pdf attached to this entry)(wcl, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee re #15 motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602062731. (wcl, )
March 22, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #15 MOTION - Attorney Brandee J. Kowalzyk for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Taylor Tapley Daly by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly)(Morris, George) Modified on 3/24/2021 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brandee J. Kowalzyk by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George) Modified on 3/24/2021 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: this #13 joint motion to stay is GRANTED; Accordingly, all pending deadlines in this case are STAYED for 120 days; The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court on or before 7/16/2021, regarding the status of the settlement discussions; If the parties have not settled the case at that time, the Court will enter an amended scheduling order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/19/2021. (amf, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, Jill Riley. (Daly, Taylor) Modified on 3/18/2021 to add Jill Riley as a filer (wcl, ).
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: A telephone hearing is hereby set for 3/31/2021 at 11:00 A.M.. Counsel shall contact chambers for the call-in number. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/11/2021. (furn: calendar, dh) (No pdf attached to this entry)(wcl, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Richard B. North, Jr. is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/10/2021. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
March 10, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S TEXT ORDER (DOC # 11) - Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by George LaFayette Morris, IV on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Babb Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Case Number 2:18-cv-01148-DGC. Docket sheet and Certified copies of MDL transfer order, MDL docket sheet, and MDL case documents received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from AZD Clerk (Attachments: #1 AZ MDL Docket 2:15md2641-DGC, #2 Case Mgt Order No. 47, #3 DKT 000248, #4 DKT 000249, #5 DKT 000269, #6 DKT 000303, #7 DKT 000314, #8 DKT 000363, #9 DKT 000364, #10 DKT 000365, #11 DKT 000366, #12 DKT 000372, #13 DKT 000401, #14 DKT 000519, #15 DKT 000699, #16 DKT 000927, #17 DKT 001108, #18 DKT 001153-1, #19 DKT 001153-2, #20 DKT 001259, #21 DKT 001319, #22 DKT 001485, #23 DKT 001662, #24 DKT 001663, #25 DKT 002238, #26 DKT 002239, #27 DKT 002813, #28 DKT 003214, #29 DKT 003215, #30 DKT 003272, #31 DKT 003312, #32 DKT 003313, #33 DKT 003314, #34 DKT 003372, #35 DKT 003398, #36 DKT 003685, #37 DKT 004015, #38 DKT 004016, #39 DKT 004141, #40 DKT 004311, #41 DKT 004335, #42 DKT 004339, #43 DKT 004865, #44 DKT 004866, #45 DKT 005007, #46 DKT 005285, #47 DKT 005770, #48 DKT 005881, #49 DKT 005883, #50 DKT 006227, #51 DKT 006799, #52 DKT 008113, #53 DKT 008315, #54 DKT 008871, #55 DKT 008872, #56 DKT 008874, #57 DKT 009415, #58 DKT 009428, #59 DKT 009432, #60 DKT 009433, #61 DKT 009434, #62 DKT 009770, #63 DKT 009771, #64 DKT 009772, #65 DKT 009773, #66 DKT 009775, #67 DKT 009861, #68 DKT 009881, #69 DKT 009991, #70 DKT 010051, #71 DKT 010052, #72 DKT 010072, #73 DKT 010075, #74 DKT 010230, #75 DKT 010231, #76 DKT 010235, #77 DKT 010258, #78 DKT 010323, #79 DKT 010348, #80 DKT 010382, #81 DKT 010403, #82 DKT 010404, #83 DKT 010438, #84 DKT 010486, #85 DKT 010489, #86 DKT 010497, #87 DKT 010524, #88 DKT 010587, #89 DKT 010819, #90 DKT 010920, #91 DKT 010922, #92 DKT 010947, #93 DKT 011011, #94 DKT 011041, #95 DKT 011064, #96 DKT 011073, #97 DKT 011080, #98 DKT 011082, #99 DKT 011256, #100 DKT 011313, #101 DKT 011320, #102 DKT 011321, #103 DKT 011659, #104 DKT 011871, #105 DKT 012007, #106 DKT 012061, #107 DKT 012202, #108 DKT 012357, #109 DKT 012507, #110 DKT 012508, #111 DKT 012533, #112 DKT 012589, #113 DKT 012590, #114 DKT 012593, #115 DKT 012595, #116 DKT 012598, #117 DKT 012830, #118 DKT 012853, #119 DKT 012971, #120 DKT 013329, #121 DKT 015098, #122 DKT 015176, #123 DKT 016343, #124 DKT 016992, #125 DKT 017008, #126 DKT 017285, #127 DKT 017386, #128 DKT 017401, #129 DKT 017494, #130 DKT 017513, #131 DKT 017582, #132 DKT 018038)(djy, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-01148. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Middle District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-1148-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15384017 filed by Terry Riley, Jill Riley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Riley
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Arati C. Furness
Represented By: Steven S Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Riley
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Arati C. Furness
Represented By: Steven S Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?