Kister v. Turner (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: John Andrew Kister
Defendant: Mr. Turner
Case Number: 2:2021cv00196
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #6 Order signed by O.H. for Mr. Turner, served on 4/7/2021. (bes, )
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 5/5/2021 the plf shall file a response to the written report filed by the dft addressing each of the arguments/defenses raised therein, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/15/2021. (bes, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT - Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Mr. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (SEALED), #2 Exhibit A-1 (SEALED))(bes, )
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON MOTION granting #7 Motion to file special report and Exhibits under seal; Upon receipt of the special of the special report and exhibit(s) from Dft, the Clerk is Directed to place these documents under seal. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/12/2021. (bes, )
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Mr. Turner.(Piggott, Philip)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mr. Turner. (Piggott, Philip)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to File Special Report Under Seal by Mr. Turner. (Piggott, Philip)
April 9, 2021 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Defendant Mr. Turner. (amf, )
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 5/17/2021; The CLERK is hereby DIRECTED to (i) furnish a copy of this order to the plff, (ii) provide a copy of this order and the complaint to ALDOC General Counsel and Counsel for Wexford Health Sources, Inc., and (iii) serve a copy of this order together with a copy of the complaint via certified mail to the dft. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/5/2021. (bes, )
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION granting #4 Motion to pay the initial partial filing fee when funds are available; further ORDERED that such portion of the #3 order requiring payment of an initial partial filing fee is VACATED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/5/2021. (bes, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee When Funds Available by John Andrew Kister. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(bes, )
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (VACATED PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #5 ORDER) ORDER ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $17.33 be paid on or before 3/29/2021; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Bullock CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/9/2021. (Furn: Cashier) (bes, ) Modified on 3/9/2021 to reflect copies mailed to account clerk at Bullock and not Elmore CF (bes, ). Modified on 4/5/2021 (bes, ).
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by John Andrew Kister. (hrs, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Mr. Turner, filed by John Andrew Kister. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Complaint)(hrs, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/9/2021 to correct main PDF that had an upside down page) (bes, ). Modified on 3/9/2021 (bes, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kister v. Turner (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrew Kister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Turner
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?