Kister v. Wynn et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: John Andrew Kister
Defendant: Maria Wynn, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Tahir Siddiq and Hugh Hood
Case Number: 2:2021cv00222
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Service package containing #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint & #7 Order sent to Hugh Hood was returned with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Unable to Forward, Unable to Forward, Return to Sender". (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 22 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by Illegible for Wexford Health Sources, Inc., served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (amf, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 5/17/2021 the plaintiff shall file a response to the reports filed by the defendants addressing each of the arguments/defenses raised therein, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/26/2021. (amf, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 20 (NOTICE of Filing) Response to Order re #19 Order by Hugh Hood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 5/24/2021 the defendants shall file a further supplement to their special report, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/23/2021. (amf, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 18 (NOTICE of Filing) Response to Order re #17 Order by Hugh Hood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip) Modified on 4/23/2021 to clarify the docket text (amf, ).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 5/24/2021 the defendants shall file a supplement to their special report which contains an affidavit or properly sworn declaration from defendant Hugh Hood which addresses the claims lodged against him in the complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/23/2021. (amf, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 16 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Hugh Hood, Tahir Siddiq, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Maria Wynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B)(Piggott, Philip)
April 22, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Piggott, Philip)
April 22, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tahir Siddiq. (Piggott, Philip)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Maria Wynn. (Piggott, Philip)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hugh Hood. (Piggott, Philip)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Hugh Hood, Tahir Siddiq, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Maria Wynn.(Piggott, Philip)
April 22, 2021 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Defendants Hugh Hood, Tahir Siddiq, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., & Maria Wynn. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by OH for Tahir Siddiq, served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (amf, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by OH for Maria Wynn, served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (amf, )
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER construing the #4 motion demanding jury trial as a motion for leave to file a jury demand; ORDER granting #4 motion for leave to file a jury demand; DIRECTING the Clerk to indicate on the docket that Plaintiff has made a jury demand in this case. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/13/2021. (amf, )
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 5/24/2021; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with #1 complaint to the individuals named as defendants; mailed by regular mail to ADOC General Counsel & Counsel for Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/13/2021. (amf, )
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #5 Motion to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee When Funds Available; further ORDERED that such portion of the #3 order requiring payment of an initial partial filing fee is VACATED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/13/2021. (amf, )
April 12, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Andrew Kister. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee When Funds Available by John Andrew Kister. (amf, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION Demanding Jury Trial by John Andrew Kister. (amf, )
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (PORTION REQUIRING PAYMENT OF INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE IS VACATED, PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #6 ORDER) ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $ 17.27 be paid on or before 4/2/2021; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Bullock CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/17/2021. (Furnished: Cashier) (amf, ) Modified on 4/13/2021 (amf, ).
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by John Andrew Kister. (es, )
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Hugh Hood, Tahir Siddiq, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Maria Wynn, filed by John Andrew Kister. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Complaint)(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kister v. Wynn et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Wynn
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahir Siddiq
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Hood
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrew Kister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?