Wyatt v. Stokes Chevrolet, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mildred Wyatt
Defendant: Stokes Chevrolet, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00272
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Stokes Chevrolet, Inc.. (Coleman, Thomas) Modified on 6/2/2021 to clarify as satisfying #7 deficiency notice (cwl, ).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is ORDERED that any party wishing to provide such consent must complete the form and submit it to the Clerk of Court by 6/10/2021, as further set out in order. The parties must not file consent forms into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 5/20/2021. (cwl, )
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable, as further set out in order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/10/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 5/20/2021. (cwl, )
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Stokes Chevrolet, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant Stokes Chevrolet, Inc.. (amf, )
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Stokes Chevrolet, Inc..(Coleman, Thomas)
May 20, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #5 ANSWER - Attorney Robert Byars Stewart for Defendant Stokes Chevrolet, Inc. added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mildred Wyatt; Stokes Chevrolet, Inc. waiver sent on 4/6/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Donald, Thomas)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Mildred Wyatt. (amf, )
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mildred Wyatt. (amf, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stokes Chevrolet, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602062857), filed by Mildred Wyatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
April 5, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mildred Wyatt. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyatt v. Stokes Chevrolet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Wyatt
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Donald
Represented By: Michael Edward Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stokes Chevrolet, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Byars Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?