Bret L. Parrish Architect, LLC v. Future Ensights, LLC
Plaintiff: Bret L. Parrish Architect, LLC
Defendant: Future Ensights, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00274
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (bes, )
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable, as further set out in order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/10/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 5/20/2021. (cwl, )
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: It is ORDERED that any party wishing to provide such consent must complete the form and submit it to the Clerk of Court by 6/10/2021, as further set out in order. The parties may not electronically submit reassignment forms. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 5/20/2021. (cwl, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Counterclaim by Bret L. Parrish Architect, LLC.(Ott, Ann)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DEF) Future Ensights, LLC. (cwl, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Future Ensights, LLC. (Wilson, Frank)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with COUNTERCLAIM, with Jury Demand by Future Ensights, LLC.(Wilson, Frank) Modified on 4/29/2021 to add counterclaim text (cwl, ).
April 29, 2021 COUNTERCLAIM against Bret L. Parrish Architect, LLC, filed by Future Ensights, LLC. (NO pdf attached to this entry - see doc #6 for pdf)(cwl, )
April 29, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #6 ANSWER - Attorney James David Martin for Future Ensights, LLC added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Summons signed by Natalie L. for Future Ensights, LLC served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (cwl, )
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Future Ensights, LLC.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cwl, )
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Bret L. Parrish Architect, LLC. (cwl, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bret L. Parrish Architect, LLC. (cwl, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Future Ensights, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602062858.), filed by Bret L. Parrish Architect, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 receipt)(cwl, ) Modified on 4/6/2021 to correct receipt #(cwl, ).
April 5, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bret L. Parrish Architect, LLC. (NO pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bret L. Parrish Architect, LLC v. Future Ensights, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Ensights, LLC
Represented By: Frank Moseley Wilson
Represented By: James David Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret L. Parrish Architect, LLC
Represented By: Ann Ashton Holmes Ott
Represented By: John McDavid Flowers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?