Mizell v. Citizen Bank et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Haywood Jackson Mizell
Defendant: James H. Weatherford, Citizen Bank, Enterprise, AL and Citizen Bank
Case Number: 2:2021cv00337
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Haywood Jackson Mizell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Claim)(am, )
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: it is ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a response to the #8 motion to dismiss on or before 6/30/2021; The movant shall file a reply on or before 7/7/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/11/2021. (am, )
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Citizen Bank, James H. Weatherford. (Cotter, Ross)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous , First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Citizen Bank, James H. Weatherford. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Cotter, Ross)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & Complaint signed by Jacquelyn for Citizen Bank served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (am, )
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & Complaint signed by Kacy Qualls for James H. Weatherford served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (am, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Citizen Bank, James H. Weatherford; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint. (bes, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the above-styled action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/14/2021. (am, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Haywood Jackson Mizell re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (am, )
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Haywood Jackson Mizell; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citizen Bank, James H. Weatherford ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602063202.), filed by Haywood Jackson Mizell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mizell v. Citizen Bank et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haywood Jackson Mizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Weatherford
Represented By: Ross Rainer Cotter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizen Bank, Enterprise, AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizen Bank
Represented By: Ross Rainer Cotter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?