Green v. Cajun Operating Company
Plaintiff: Renee Green
Defendant: Cajun Operating Company doing business as Church's Chicken
Case Number: 2:2021cv00351
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Redmond, Wesley)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/12/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/14/2021. (wcl, )
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties have the right to consent to the undersigned conducting all proceedings and entering judgment in this case under 28 USC 636(c); It is ORDERED that any party wishing to provide such consent must complete the form and submit it to the Clerk of Court by 7/12/2021; The parties may electronically prepare and submit consent forms by logging into CM/ECF and selecting the Magistrate Judge Consent Form event; The parties may also submit consent forms via mail to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, One Church Street, Room B-110, Montgomery, AL 36104; The parties must not file consent forms into the record; Alternatively, the parties have the right to request reassignment of this case to a United States District Judge; Attached to this order is a reassignment form; Any party wishing to submit the reassignment form must mail it to the above address by 7/12/2021; The parties may not electronically submit reassignment forms. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/14/2021. (wcl, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cajun Operating Company. (Redmond, Wesley)
June 11, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #6 ANSWER - Attorney Susan Ware Bullock for Cajun Operating Company added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Cajun Operating Company. (Redmond, Wesley)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 Cajun Operating Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cajun Operating Company.(Redmond, Wesley)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Cajun Operating Company served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (wcl, )
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Renee Green. (djy, )
May 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cajun Operating Company and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Renee Green. (djy, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cajun Operating Company ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602063366.), filed by Renee Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )
May 17, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Renee Green. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Cajun Operating Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cajun Operating Company doing business as Church's Chicken
Represented By: Susan Ware Bullock
Represented By: Wesley Clyde Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Green
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?