Miller v. AvanteUSA, L.P.
Plaintiff: Clayton Miller
Defendant: AvanteUSA, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00352
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re #9 Notice. (amf, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Clayton Miller (Seals, Wallace)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #7 motion to dismiss is DENIED; further ORDERED that on or before 7/12/2021, the Plaintiff shall file a voluntary notice of dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 7/2/2021. (amf, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Clayton Miller. (Seals, Wallace)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the plaintiff shall show cause on or before 7/12/2021, as to why the claims against the defendant should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 6/25/2021. (amf, )
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement, signed by CT CORPORATION for AvanteUSA, L.P., served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (amf, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AvanteUSA, L.P.; mailed by CMRRR with #1 Complaint & #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement. (amf, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Clayton Miller. (amf, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Clayton Miller. (amf, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AvanteUSA, L.P. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602063363), filed by Clayton Miller. (Attachments: #1 Request for Service by Certified Mail, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
May 17, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clayton Miller. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. AvanteUSA, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Miller
Represented By: Wallace Whitney Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AvanteUSA, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?