Dortch v. Boynes et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Harold L. Dortch
Defendant: Geno Lysykanyez, Nurse Jackson, Patrice Richie Jones and Omar Boynes
Case Number: 2:2021cv00381
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for failures to prosecute and comply with Court orders; Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 7/19/2021. (wcl, )
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing that by 6/24/2021, plf must either pay the $402 administrative and filing fee or file an application for leave to proceed informa pauperis, as further set out in order; To aid Plaintiff in complying with this Order, the Clerk is DIRECTED to (1) provide Plaintiff with an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and (2) provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plaintiff is detained, as further set out in order; Plaintiff must immediately inform the Court and Defendants or Defendants counsel of any change in his address, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 6/3/21. Mailed with IFP form to plaintiff and account clerk @ Bullock, as directed.(djy, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Omar Boynes, Nurse Jackson, Patrice Richie Jones, Geno Lysykanyez, filed by Harold L. Dortch.(NO IFP; NO FILING FEE) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(hrs, )
May 26, 2021 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Harold L. Dortch. (No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (hrs, )
May 26, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Harold L. Dortch.. (No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dortch v. Boynes et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold L. Dortch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geno Lysykanyez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Richie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Boynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?