Mobley v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Cody Eugene Mobley
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00388
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time; the deadline for the Government to file a response to Petitioner's 2255 motion is extended to 9/7/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/30/2021. (amf, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Correction re #4 Affidavit, to attach a corrected PDF document to 1) Reflect the correct case style; 2) Reflect the pleading date as of 6/21/2021 & not 6/21/2029; and 3) Fill in the blank signature line. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #4 )(amf, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Correction re #3 Affidavit, to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the proper case style on the pleading. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #3 )(amf, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re #2 Order by Thomas M. Goggans. (Goggans, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2021: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (amf, ). Modified on 6/29/2021 to clarify the docket text to reflect this entry as an affidavit and not a response to order (amf, ).
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), #2 Order by United States of America. (Bates, Brandon)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #2 Order by Nate Wenstrup. (Wenstrup, Nate) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/30/2021 to attach a corrected PDF document to 1) Reflect the correct case style; 2) Reflect the pleading date as of 6/21/2021 & not 6/21/2029; and 3) Fill in the blank signature line) (amf, ). Modified on 6/30/2021 (amf, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2021: #1 Certificate of Service) (amf, ).
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #2 Order by Stephen P. Ganter. (Ganter, Stephen) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/29/2021 to attach a corrected PDF document to to reflect the proper case style) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2021: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (amf, ). Modified on 6/29/2021 (amf, ).
June 22, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #2 Order sent to Cody Eugene Mobley was returned with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward". (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: DIRECTING the Clerk to serve a copy of the #1 2255 motion on the U.S. Attorney for the Middle District of Alabama; The U.S. Attorney is ORDERED to file a response by 7/8/2021; DIRECTING the Clerk to to provide a copy of the #1 2255 motion to attorneys Nate Wenstrup, Thomas M. Goggans, and Stephen P. Ganter; it is ORDERED that by 6/28/2021, attorneys Wenstrup, Goggans, and Ganter shall file with the Court affidavits that address all claims of ineffective assistance of counsel presented against them in the #1 2255 motion. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/3/2021. (amf, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Cody Eugene Mobley. (Attachments: #1 Criminal Docket Sheet, #2 Criminal Judgement)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobley v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Eugene Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Brandon Wade Bates
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?