Ellison v. State of Alabama et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Billy Keith Ellison
Defendant: Montgomery County Jail, State of Minnesota, State of Alabama, State of Missouri and State of Utah
Case Number: 2:2021cv00439
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and plf must pay the civil Filing Fee by 9/1/2021, as further set out in order; directing the clerk to stay service of process pending further notice from the court. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 8/18/2021. (djy, )
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to to the Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/1/2021. (djy, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Billy Keith Ellison. (dmn, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Billy Keith Ellison. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed IFP)(dmn, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Montgomery County Jail, State of Alabama, State of Minnesota, State of Missouri, State of Utah, filed by Billy Keith Ellison.(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellison v. State of Alabama et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Keith Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?