Kister v. Jones et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: John Andrew Kister
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall and Patrice Richie Jones
Case Number: 2:2021cv00444
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: W Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that (1) The #2 Recommendation is ADOPTED; and (2) This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under the provisions of 28 USC 2241(d). Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/4/2021. (wcl, )
August 4, 2021 Case transferred to District of Alabama Northern; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
August 4, 2021 Received email from ALND regarding receipt of e-transfer case; ALND case number assigned as 5:21-cv-01069. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
August 2, 2021 No objections filed to the #2 Recommendation. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 Response (letter) re #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by John Andrew Kister. (cwl, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). Objections to R&R due by 7/27/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 7/12/2021. (cwl, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 4602063798.), filed by John Andrew Kister. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Alabama Rules of Criminal Procedure - Rule 32 Petition and Brief, #15 Filing Fee)(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kister v. Jones et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Richie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrew Kister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?