Mathis v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Diamond Mathis
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00445
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time; the deadline for the Government to file a response to Petitioner's 2255 motion is extended to 10/13/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/19/2021. (es, )
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United States of America. (Duraski, Russell)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: directing US Attorney to file a response to the #4 amended 2255 motion on or before 9/13/2021, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the CLERK to serve a copy of the amended 2255 motion upon the US Attorney for the ALMD. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/13/2021. (Copies furnished as directed) (wcl, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 Amended MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Diamond Mathis. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Accompany 28 USC 2255 Motion)(amf, ) Modified on 8/13/2021 to reflect copy has been furnished as directed in the court's #5 Order (wcl, ).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing plaintiff to inform the Court by 8/6/2021, of her wishes to do one of the following: (1) continue to proceed before the Court under 28 U.S.C. 2255 on any claims in her operative 2255 motion (Doc. #2 ); or (2) amend her operative 2255 motion to assert any additional claims she wishes to assert under 2255; or (3) withdraw her motion; directing the clerk to send the plf the form for filing a 2255 motion; advising plf if she wishes to proceed and assert claims under 2255, she should complete and file the form provided to her by the Clerk, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/7/2021. Mailed to plf with 2255 form, as directed.(djy, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Diamond Mathis. (Attachments: #1 supporting document, #2 CR Judgment in 2:19CR298, #3 criminal docket sheet 2:19cr298)(djy, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 Copy of ORDER entered in CR 2:19CR298-MHT on 6/30/2021 directing the opening of a new civil action under 28 USC 2255, as further set out in order. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Russell Turner Duraski
Represented By: Verne H. Speirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?