Talley v. Toney et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Adrian Fitzgerald Talley, Jr.
Defendant: Deborah Toney, Steven T. Marshall, State of Alabama, Alabama Department of Corrections and Jefferson S. Dunn
Case Number: 2:2021cv00452
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: it is ORDERED that by 9/9/2021, Talley shall show cause why his 2254 petition should not be dismissed as untimely under AEDPA's 1 year limitation period and for the other reasons argued by Respondents; Show Cause Response due by 9/9/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/19/2021. (bes, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Steven T. Marshall, Deborah Toney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Vol 1 - Clerk's Record and Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal, CR-16-0473, #2 Exhibit A - Vol 2 - Clerk's Record and Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal, CR-16-0473, #3 Exhibit A - Vol 3 - Clerk's Record and Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal, CR-16-0473, #4 Exhibit B - Appellant's Brief on Direct Appeal, CR-16-0473, #5 Exhibit C - Alabama Court of Criminal Appeal's Decision, CR-16-0473, #6 Exhibit D - Alabama Court of Criminal Appeal's Certificate of Judgement, CR-16-0473)(Cuthbert, Laura)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition & #6 Order, signed by Illegible for Deborah Toney, served on 8/2/2021 (per USPS website), answer due 8/20/2021. (amf, )
August 3, 2021 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Defendants Steven T. Marshall & Deborah Toney. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition & #6 Order, signed by J. Taylor for Steven T. Marshall, Alabama Attorney General, served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (amf, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Irby Cuthbert on behalf of Steven T. Marshall, Deborah Toney (Cuthbert, Laura)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steven T. Marshall, Deborah Toney. (Cuthbert, Laura)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 8/20/2021; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed by CMRRR w/copies of #1 petition to Warden Deborah Toney & the Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/28/2021. (amf, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee received re #1 Petition: $ 5.00, receipt number 4602064072. (amf, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE for Certificate of Service filed by Adrian Fitzgerald Talley, Jr.. (amf, )
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: It is therefore ORDERED that by 7/23/2021, Petitioner shall forward the $5 filing fee to the Clerk of Court; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish a copy of this Order to the account clerk at Limestone CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/9/2021. (Furnished to account clerk as directed) (amf, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Adrian Fitzgerald Talley, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit In Support of App IFP)(es, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Adrian Fitzgerald Talley, Jr.(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talley v. Toney et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Fitzgerald Talley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Toney
Represented By: Laura Irby Cuthbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Represented By: Laura Irby Cuthbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?