Jones v. Turman et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Joseph C. Jones and Joseph C. Jones, II
Defendant: Blake Turman, Greg White, Keith Varner and Thomas Hugghins
Case Number: 2:2021cv00457
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer re #5 Order to file special report within 40 days of the date of this order, by Thomas Hugghins, Blake Turman, Keith Varner. (Lyckman, Haley)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley Elizabeth Lyckman on behalf of Thomas Hugghins, Blake Turman, Keith Varner (Lyckman, Haley)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Thomas Hugghins, Blake Turman, Keith Varner. (Lyckman, Haley)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Complaint, & #5 Order signed by Morris Patton for Thomas Hugghins served on 8/3/2021, answer due 9/8/2021; Blake Turman served on 8/3/2021, answer due 9/8/2021; Keith Varner served on 8/3/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (am, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 9/8/2021, as further set out in Order; mailed by CMRRR with #1 complaint to Defendants Turman, Varner and Hugghins. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/30/2021. (am, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $5.00, receipt number 4602064099. (am, )
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $4.67 be paid on or before 7/28/2021; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Covington County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/8/2021. (furn: cashier) (wcl, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Joseph C. Jones. (hrs, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Thomas Hugghins, Blake Turman, Keith Varner, Greg White, filed by Joseph C. Jones.(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Turman et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph C. Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Turman
Represented By: Haley Elizabeth Lyckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Varner
Represented By: Haley Elizabeth Lyckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hugghins
Represented By: Haley Elizabeth Lyckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?