Coleman v. Nixon (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Dwight R. Coleman, Robert Earl Jackson Little, Jason Daniels, Jason Bell, Cory Webster, Travis Mims, Christian Vinson, Channing Turner, Keenan Reynolds, Jacob Barrett, Phuco Nguyon, Christopher Hicks, Donald Echols, Jeremy Dudley, Jeremiah Lee Pettiway, Robert P. Bindwell, Edward Jones, Jason Carroll, Justin Cain, Kenneth Thomas and Jason Jerod Daniels
Defendant: Larry Nixon
Case Number: 2:2021cv00461
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #6 Order sent to Dwight R. Coleman was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable To Forward." (no pdf attached to this entry) (hfc, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for plf's failure to provide the court with a current address; Objections to R&R due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/23/21. (djy, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 8/9/2021 Plf shall file with the court a current address and show cause why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to adequately prosecute this action, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/30/2021. (wcl, )
July 29, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #3 & #4 Orders sent to Dwight R. Coleman were returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Inmate No Longer At This Facility, Refused, Unable To Forward." (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
July 23, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of #3 order sent to Keenan Reynolds returned in mail with the following notation, "Returned to sender, inmate no longer at this facility" (NO PDF document attached to this entry). (djy, )
July 23, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of #3 order sent to Channing Turner returned in mail with the following notation, "Returned to sender, inmate no longer at this facility" (NO PDF document attached to this entry). (djy, )
July 23, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of #3 order sent to Robert P. Bindwell returned in mail with the following notation, "Returned to sender, inmate no longer at this facility" (NO PDF document attached to this entry). (djy, )
July 23, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of #3 order sent to Cory Webster returned in mail with the following notation, "Returned to sender, inmate no longer at this facility" (NO PDF document attached to this entry). (djy, )
July 23, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of #3 order sent to Robert Earl Jackson Little returned in mail with the following notation, "Returned to sender, inmate no longer at this facility" (NO PDF document attached to this entry). (djy, ) . Modified on 7/26/2021 to correct filed date to 7/23/2021 (qc/djy, ).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $5.83 be paid on or before 8/4/2021; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Lowndes County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/13/2021. (furn: cashier) (wcl, )
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that this case proceed with Dwight R. Coleman as the sole plf; The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to provide the other inmates listed in the complaint with a copy of this order, the form used by inmates to file actions under 42 USC 1983, and an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; The inmates are advised that if they seek to proceed on claims challenging conditions to which they were subjected at the Autauga County Metro Jail they may do so by each filling a separate 42 USC 1983 action with this court accompanied by either an application to proceed in forma pauperis or the $350 filing and $52 administrative fee applicable in such cases. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/13/2021. (wcl, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Dwight R. Coleman. (hrs, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/12/2021) (wcl, ). Modified on 7/12/2021 to correct a clerical error to attach the correct PDF document of the application ifp for 21cv461 (wcl, ).
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Larry Nixon, filed by Phuco Nguyon, Christian Vinson, Robert Earl Jackson Little, Edward Jones, Dwight R. Coleman, Jason Carroll, Robert P. Bindwell, Donald Echols, Travis Mims, Jason Daniels, Keenan Reynolds, Christopher Hicks, Jeremy Dudley, Jeremiah Lee Pettiway, Kenneth Thomas, Channing Turner, Jason Bell, Justin Cain, Jacob Barrett, Cory Webster.(hrs, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/12/2021) (wcl, ). Modified on 7/12/2021 to correct a clerical error to attach the correct PDF document of the complaint for 21cv461 (wcl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Nixon (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight R. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Earl Jackson Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Channing Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keenan Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phuco Nguyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Lee Pettiway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert P. Bindwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Jerod Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?