Tilley v. SC Montgomery Seniors Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Tilley
Defendant: SC Montgomery Seniors Management, LLC and Terence Scott
Case Number: 2:2021cv00483
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from SC Montgomery Seniors Management, LLC and Terence Scott on or before 9/17/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 9/1/2021. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFTs) SC Montgomery Seniors Management, LLC, Terence Scott. (bes, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by SC Montgomery Seniors Management, LLC, Terence Scott. (Turner, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SC Montgomery Seniors Management, LLC, Terence Scott. (Turner, Michael) Modified on 9/1/2021 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Calvin Tilley re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Lowery, Courtney)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SC Montgomery Seniors Management, LLC, Terence Scott & mailed to counsel via USPS mail for service by process server. (cwl, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Calvin Tilley; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Calvin Tilley. (cwl, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SC Montgomery Seniors Management, LLC, Terence Scott ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064016.), filed by Calvin Tilley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tilley v. SC Montgomery Seniors Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Tilley
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Montgomery Seniors Management, LLC
Represented By: Michael Elliott Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence Scott
Represented By: Michael Elliott Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?