Davis v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Osie Lee Davis
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00485
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION GRANTING #6 MOTION for Extension of Time and that the deadline for the government to file a response to petitioner's 2255 motion is extended to 10/22/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/18/2021. (djy, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United States of America. (Counts, Eric)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re #2 Order,,, by Stephen P. Ganter. (Ganter, Stephen)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT by Thomas M. Goggans. (Goggans, Thomas)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT by James Matthew Williams. (Williams, James)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the clerk to serve a copy of the 2255 motion #1 on the US Attorney for the Middle District of Alabama; the US Attorney is ORDERED to file a response by 8/23/2021, as further set out in order; directing the clerk to provide a copy of the 2255 motion to attorneys Stephen P. Ganter, James Matthew Williams, and Thomas M. Goggans; ORDERING that by 8/13/2021, attorneys Ganter, Williams, and Goggans shall file with the Court affidavits that address all claims of ineffective assistance of counsel presented against them in the 2255 motion, as further set out in order; directing the clerk not to accept any document submitted by Davis that does not comply with the FRCP and this order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/21/2021. Order and 2255 motion sent electronically to USA and named attorneys via CM/ECF.(djy, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Osie Lee Davis. (Attachments: #1 CR Judgment 2:19cv57-01, #2 CR docket sheet 2:19cv57-01)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osie Lee Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Eric M Counts
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Represented By: Robert K Nichols, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?