Roberts v. Walton Enterprises (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lee Roberts
Defendant: Walton Enterprises
Case Number: 2:2021cv00491
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Petition for a Writ of Mandamus. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/13/2021. (wcl, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus by Jimmy Lee Roberts. (dmn, )
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order; further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to defer service of process on the dft(s) until further order of the court, following the court's 1915(e) review of the plf's complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 7/29/2021. (wcl, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to the United States Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/27/2021. (wcl, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATION of the pro se party by Jimmy Lee Roberts. (djy, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 INFORMATION of the pro se party by Jimmy Lee Roberts. (djy, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jimmy Lee Roberts. (djy, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy Lee Roberts. (Attachments: #1 application to proceed (long form))(djy, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walton Enterprises, filed by Jimmy Lee Roberts. (Attachments: #1 supporting document, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Walton Enterprises (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lee Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walton Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?