Pogue v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela N. Pogue
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC and Selene Finance, LP
Case Number: 2:2021cv00505
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER directing that any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction must complete the form and submit it to the clerk by 10/22/2021, as further set out in order; any party wishing to submit the reassignment from must mail it to the clerk by 10/22/2021; the parties may not electronically submit reassignment forms. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/24/2021. (djy, )
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER directing that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/22/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/24/2021. (djy, )
September 23, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (And Affirmative Defenses) by Selene Finance, LP.(Mitchell, Matthew)
September 23, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Steadman, Joseph)
September 22, 2021 Filing 25 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Steadman, Joseph)
September 13, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (am, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Equifax Information Services, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/23/2021. (am, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2021: #1 Standing Order & Example) (am, ).
September 10, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Young, Leilus)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Selene Finance, LP's #19 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; Defendant Selene Finance, LP may file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 9/23/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/10/2021. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC may respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 9/23/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/8/2021. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Selene Finance, LP. (Mitchell, Matthew)
September 8, 2021 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Steadman, Joseph)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time; defendant Equifax Information Services LLC may file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 9/9/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/27/2021. (NO PDF document attached to this order). (djy, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Steadman, Joseph)
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Selene Finance, LP (djy, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time; def Selene may file an answer to plf's complaint on or before 9/9/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/23/2021. (djy, )
August 20, 2021 ***Attorney Kristen Peters Watson for Selene Finance, LP added pursuant to #12 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Selene Finance, LP. (Mitchell, Matthew)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Selene Finance, LP. (Mitchell, Matthew)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time; defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. shall file an answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 9/10/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/16/2021. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (def) Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (am, )
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Young, Leilus)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Young, Leilus)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Kelly Webster for Selene Finance, LP, served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (amf, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Kelly Webster for Equifax Information Services, LLC, served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (amf, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Experian Information Solutions, Inc., served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (amf, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Selene Finance, LP and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to these defendants. (djy, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Pamela N. Pogue. (djy, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Pamela N. Pogue. (djy, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Selene Finance, LP ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064107.), filed by Pamela N. Pogue. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )
July 29, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pamela N. Pogue. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See docket entry #1 ). (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pogue v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela N. Pogue
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Leilus Jackson Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Joseph D. Steadman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance, LP
Represented By: Kristen Peters Watson
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?