Park v. B & M Management Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Alisa Park
Defendant: B & M Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00509
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Weller, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Andrea Ugarte. (Lowery, Courtney) Modified on 9/29/2021 to clean up text. (dmn, )
September 9, 2021 ***Attorney Blake Edward Brookshire added for B & M Management Company, LLC. (dmn, ) (see Doc. #5 for pdf)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) reportcontaining the discovery plan shall be filed as soon aspracticable but not later than 9/30/2021, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/9/2021. (djy, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by B & M Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Members, Managers and Affiliates)(Weller, Christopher)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by B & M Management Company, LLC.(Weller, Christopher)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued; service materials for B & M Management Company, LLC returned to counsel for personal service. (dmn, ) Modified on 8/6/2021 to correct CMRRR to personal service due to docketing error. (dmn, )
August 6, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re #4 Summons Issued. The referenced docket entry was corrected to reflect personal service in place of CMRRR due to docketing error. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alisa Park. (dmn, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/11/2021) (dmn, ). Modified on 8/11/2021 to correct received date and include pdf with original signature. (dmn, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT to Join #1 Complaint - Collective Action by Alisa Park. (dmn, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against B & M Management Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064145.), filed by Alisa Park. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park v. B & M Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Park
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & M Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Blake Edward Brookshire
Represented By: Christopher William Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?