Dortch v. Harris (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Harold L. Dortch
Defendant: Cpt. Harriss and Laquanda Harris
Case Number: 2:2021cv00512
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Docketing Error re #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel which was filed in the wrong case on 8/27/2021; This motion is hereby STRICKEN from the record as a docketing error and the parties are instructed to disregard the entry on the court's docket for this case. (bes, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 (DISREGARD, DOCKETED IN INCORRECT CIVIL ACTION) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Harold L. Dortch. (bll, ) Modified on 8/27/2021 (bes, ).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 8/24/2021, Plaintiff must file a prison account statement from the inmate account clerk; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plaintiff is detained. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/10/2021. (Mailed to account clerk at Bullock) (amf, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents by Harold L. Dortch.(bll, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner Transaction Report by Harold L. Dortch. (bll, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Laquanda Harris, filed by Harold L. Dortch.(bll, )
August 2, 2021 Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants by Harold L. Dortch. (No pdf attached - see document #3 ) (bll, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dortch v. Harris (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold L. Dortch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt. Harriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laquanda Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?