Jones v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Andre Jones
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv00555
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint and order of procedure signed by (no signature) on 9/1/2021 for Kilolo Kijakazi. (djy, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint and order of procedure signed by Emily Sase on 9/8/2021 for Attorney General of the US. (djy, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & #3 Order signed by Sophia Bennett for US Attorney's Office served on 9/9/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. (am, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint and order of procedure signed by Elena Franco on 8/27/2021 for SSA Office of Regional Counsel. (djy, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney, Social Security Office of Regional Counsel, and U.S. Attorney General; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint & #3 Order. (cwl, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER TO ANSWER Social Security Complaint within 90 days after the date of service of the complaint; plaintiff to file brief in support within 40 days of filing of the answer; defendant's reply brief and administrative record due within 30 days of brief filing. Copies mailed to counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 8/25/2021. (djy, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre Jones. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(hrs, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Andre Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Jones
Represented By: Hannah Grace Lindsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?