Dennis v. Drayton (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Kala Renae Dennis
Defendant: Kressida D. Drayton
Case Number: 2:2021cv00558
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 (Pro Se Letter) Response to Order re #7 Order, by Kala Renae Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(cwl, )
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that plf shall, on or before 9/3/2021, file a written notice stating how much she received in take-home pay for each month of the calendar year 2021 and her projected monthly income for the remainder of this calendar year. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/27/2021. (cwl, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 8/25/2021. (wcl, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATION of the Pro Se party to Participate in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Kala Renae Dennis. (cwl, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 INFORMATION of the Pro Se party For Participation in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Kala Renae Dennis. (cwl, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kala Renae Dennis. (cwl, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kala Renae Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Application)(cwl, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kressida D. Drayton, filed by Kala Renae Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Docs)(cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis v. Drayton (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kala Renae Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kressida D. Drayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?