Whitlow v. Fowler et al
Plaintiff: David Whitlow
Defendant: Kendra Fowler, Customers Bank doing business as BankMobile, Square, Inc. of Californa doing business as Cash App and Square, Inc. of California doing business as Cash App
Case Number: 2:2021cv00632
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Supporting Memorandum filed by Customers Bank. (Bolus, John)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: DIRECTING the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 12/7/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/16/2021. (amf, )
November 15, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Customers Bank re #15 Order to Show Cause(Bolus, John)
November 15, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by David Whitlow. (Gould, Charles)
November 8, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Customers Bank. (Bolus, John) Modified on 11/12/2021 to clarify text as reflected in pleading (es, ).
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by David Whitlow. (Gould, Charles)
November 3, 2021 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David Whitlow. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #17 for PDF) (es, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of Alias Summons and #1 Complaint/Notice of Removal signed by CT CC19 CO92 for Kendra Fowler served on 10/23/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (bes, )
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Upon consideration of the pending motions in this matter and for good cause, it is ORDERED as follows: 1.) Dft Kendra Fowler shall show cause in writing why the #10 Joint and Unopposed Motion to Dismiss should not be granted on or before 11/15/2021; 2.) The dfts shall show cause in writing why Plf's #13 Motion to Remand and Memorandum in Support should not be granted on or before 11/8/2021; The plff shall file a reply on or before 11/15/2021; 3.) The dfts shall show cause in writing why the #14 Motion to Stay Ruling on Motion to Dismiss should not be granted on or before 11/15/2021; The plf shall file a reply on or before 11/22/2021; 4.) All motions presently before the court (Docs. No. #9 , #10 , #13 , #14 ) shall be under submission on 11/22/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/25/2021. (bes, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Supporting Memorandum (Motion to Stay Ruling on Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Customers Bank Pending Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) by David Whitlow. (Gould, Charles)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by David Whitlow. (Gould, Charles) Modified on 10/22/2021 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
October 22, 2021 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by David Whitlow. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #13 for PDF) (bes, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 Alias Summons issued as to Kendra Fowler; and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Notice of Removal and all attachments. (hfc, )
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 11/3/2021, the plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why the #9 motion to dismiss filed by the defendant should not be granted; The defendant shall file a reply on or before 11/17/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/14/2021. (am, )
October 13, 2021 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Customers Bank. (NO PDF - See doc #9 ) (am, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 Joint & Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Square, Inc. of California & David Whitlow. (Jackson, Joseph) Modified on 10/14/2021 to add joint filer & clarify text as reflected in pleading (am, ).
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Supporting Memorandum by Customers Bank. (Bolus, John)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #1 motion to enlarge is GRANTED; The dft shall file an answer or other response to the plf's complaint on or before 10/13/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/1/2021. (bes, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by David Whitlow. (Gould, Charles)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Square, Inc. of California re #5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Jackson, Joseph)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Square, Inc. of California; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Customers Bank, Square, Inc. of California, David Whitlow. (bes, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Enlarge by Square, Inc. of California, Customers Bank. (Jackson, Joseph) Modified on 9/29/2021 to clarify the docket text and to add Customers Bank as filer (bes, ).
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Customers Bank. (bes, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Customers Bank from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-CV-21-900898.00. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064751) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal by Square, Inc. of California, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Receipt)(bes, )
September 22, 2021 COMPLAINT against Customers Bank, Kendra Fowler, Square, Inc. of California, filed by David Whitlow. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #2 for PDF)(bes, )
September 22, 2021 Consent to Removal re #2 Notice of Removal by Square, Inc. of California. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #2 for PDF) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitlow v. Fowler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Whitlow
Represented By: Charles Lance Gould
Represented By: Tyner David Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Customers Bank doing business as BankMobile
Represented By: John Norman Bolus
Represented By: Robert Harris Fowlkes
Represented By: Molli Masaniai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square, Inc. of Californa doing business as Cash App
Represented By: Joseph Walton Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square, Inc. of California doing business as Cash App
Represented By: Joseph Walton Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?