Bennett v. Mid South Transportation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diana Bennett
Defendant: Mid South Transportation, LLC and Mid-South Leasing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00806
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties confer and submit a report based on the trial terms and scheduling order requirements of the Middle District of Alabama, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/22/2022; Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form and send it to the Clerk by 2/22/2022; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor the reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 2/1/2022. (bes, )
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFT) Mid-South Leasing, Inc.. (bes, )
February 1, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mid-South Leasing, Inc.. (Newton, Daniel)
February 1, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mid-South Leasing, Inc..(Newton, Daniel)
February 1, 2022 ***PURSUANT TO THE #10 ANSWER - Attorney David MacArthur Wilson for Mid-South Leasing, Inc. added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mid South Transportation, LLC re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Newton, Daniel)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Mid South Transportation, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFT) Mid South Transportation, LLC. (bes, )
January 6, 2022 ***PURSUANT TO THE #6 ANSWER - Attorney Daniel Jacob Newton for Mid South Transportation, LLC added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
January 6, 2022 ***PURSUANT TO THE #6 ANSWER - Attorney David MacArthur Wilson for Mid South Transportation, LLC added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mid South Transportation, LLC.(Wilson, David)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Disclosure Statement signed by illegible for Mid South Transportation, LLC served on 12/16/2021, answer due 1/6/2022. (bes, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mid South Transportation, LLC, Mid-South Leasing, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint and #2 Disclosure Statement. (bes, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Diana Bennett. (bes, )
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Diana Bennett. (bes, )
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mid South Transportation, LLC, Mid-South Leasing, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602065413.), filed by Diana Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, )
December 6, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Diana Bennett. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Mid South Transportation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Bennett
Represented By: Jessica Emma Bonds
Represented By: John Livingston Adams
Represented By: Steven Drew Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid South Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Newton
Represented By: David MacArthur Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-South Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: David MacArthur Wilson
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?