United States of America v. Stanton et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Courtney Deandrea Stanton
Garnishee: Workforce Walker Personnel, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021mc03933
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Writ of Garnishment, #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, served on Courtney Deandrea Stanton on 3/11/2021. (bes, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to the Court by Workforce Walker Personnel, LLC (bes, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Writ of Garnishment, #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, served on Workforce Walker Personnel, LLC on 2/25/2021. (bes, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued & furnished to USMS for service. (bes, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (bes, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment, #3 Right to Claim Exemption, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee form)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Stanton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Workforce Walker Personnel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Deandrea Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samantha R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?