Outlaw v. Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Plaintiff: Irene Outlaw
Defendant: Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00031
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Irene Outlaw. (Sawyer, Kyle)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC. (amf, )
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC. (Nixon, Brooke)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC. (Nixon, Brooke)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 MOTION - Attorney Brittany R. Turner for Defendant Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ***PURSUANT TO THE #6 CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - Attorney Thomas Wendall Scroggins for Defendant Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Irene Outlaw. Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (bes, )
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC and returned to Counsel for service via Process Server. (cwl, )
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Irene Outlaw. (am, )
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Irene Outlaw. (am, )
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, filed by Irene Outlaw (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 4602065717.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outlaw v. Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Outlaw
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Brittany R. Turner
Represented By: Brooke Milstead Nixon
Represented By: Thomas Wendall Scroggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?