King et al v. The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald A. King and The Dustin Inman Society, Inc.
Defendant: The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00207
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Maxwell S. Mishkin ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number AALMDC-3243208.) by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holliday, Shannon) Modified on 6/23/2022 to reflect requesting atty (bes, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2022: #2 Certificate of Good Standing from USDC District of Columbia) (bes, ).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chad R. Bowman ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number AALMDC-3243202.) by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holliday, Shannon) Modified on 6/23/2022 to reflect requesting atty (bes, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2022: #2 Certificate of Good Standing from USDC District of Columbia) (bes, ).
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #12 unopposed motion for an extension of the deadlines in the briefing order is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' deadline to file a response to Defendant's motion to dismiss is EXTENDED to and including 8/15/2022. The deadline for Defendant to file a reply is EXTENDED to and including 8/29/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/16/2022. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Order by Donald A. King, The Dustin Inman Society, Inc.. (McKoon, James) Modified on 6/16/2022 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 BRIEFING ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #10 motion to Dismiss be submitted without oral argument on 7/14/2022; It is further ORDERED that Plfs file a response, which shall include a brief, on or before 7/7/2022; Dft may file a reply brief on or before 7/14/2022, as further set out in order; ORDER setting out other briefing requirements, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/14/2022. (bes, )
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #10 for PDF) (bes, )
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ***PURSUANT TO THE #10 MOTION - Attorney Chad R. Bowman,Maxwell S. Mishkin for The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1 to SLH Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to SLH Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to SLH Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to SLH Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to SLH Declaration)(Holliday, Shannon) Modified on 6/14/2022 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. re #7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Holliday, Shannon)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint; Answer due 6/13/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/17/2022. (No PDF attached to this entry) (es, )
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. Corporate Disclosures due by 5/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample Format)(es, )
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ***PURSUANT TO THE #5 MOTION - Attorney Robert David Segall for The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (es, )
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Donald A. King, The Dustin Inman Society, Inc.. (McKoon, James)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time for Answering the #1 Complaint by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Holliday, Shannon) Modified on 5/17/2022 to clarify text as to pleading. (es, ).
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Donald A. King, The Dustin Inman Society, Inc. re: #2 Notice of Deficiency. (McKoon, James) Modified on 5/10/2022 (am, ).
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. and mailed CMRRR w/ #1 Complaint. (am, )
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Donald A. King and The Dustin Inman Society, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc., filed by Donald A. King, The Dustin Inman Society, Inc. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 4602066654.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A. King
Represented By: James Robert McKoon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Dustin Inman Society, Inc.
Represented By: James Robert McKoon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Bowman
Represented By: Maxwell S. Mishkin
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?