McKenzie et al v. Auction.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martha McKenzie and Dan McKenzie
Defendant: Auction.com, Inc., First American Data Tree, LLC and First American Financial Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv00426
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Reply to Opposition filed by Dan McKenzie, Martha McKenzie. (Crow, Christina) Modified on 9/9/2022 to clarify exhibit 1 is contained within the main pdf (cwl, ).
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Granting #15 MOTION for Re-Setting of Hearing; resetting hearing for 9/21/2022 at 1:00 PM by video conference before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/8/2022. (furn: ag, calendar, videoconference) (term: mtn hearing & OA 9/14/2022) (No pdf attached to this entry)(cwl, )
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Re-Setting of Hearing by First American Data Tree, LLC, First American Financial Corporation. (Swann, Gerald) Modified on 9/7/2022 to correct motion event (cwl, ).
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion to remand (Doc. #6 ) is set for oral argument on 9/14/2022, at 10:00 a.m., by videoconference. The courtroom deputy shall arrange for the videoconference. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/7/2022. (furn: ag, calendar, videoconference)(cwl, )
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by First American Data Tree, LLC, First American Financial Corporation. (Swann, Gerald)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Auction.com, Inc.. (Sipes, Jade)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by First American Data Tree, LLC, First American Financial Corporation. (Swann, Gerald)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Dan McKenzie, Martha McKenzie re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Crow, Christina) Modified on 8/22/2022 to remove erroneously links (cwl, ).
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion to remand (Doc. #6 ) is set for submission, without oral argument, on 9/9/2022, with any opposition brief due by 9/2/2022, and any reply to the opposition due by 9/9/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/19/2022. (cwl, )
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Martha McKenzie, Dan McKenzie. Corporate Disclosures due by 8/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dan McKenzie, Martha McKenzie. (Crow, Christina) Modified on 8/19/2022 to clarify exhibit 1 is contained within the main PDF (cwl, ).
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dan McKenzie, Martha McKenzie. (Crow, Christina)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auction.com, Inc. from Circuit Court of Barbour County, Eufaula Division, case number 69-CV-2022-900013.00. , filed by Auction.com, Inc..(Sipes, Jade)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by First American Data Tree, LLC, First American Financial Corporation. (Swann, Gerald)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Assigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as referral Judge. (cwl, )
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Auction.com, Inc.. (Sipes, Jade)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auction.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number BALMDC-3260490) , filed by Auction.com. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B-Plaintiffs' Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit C-State Court Notice of Filing of Removal, #5 Exhibit D-Consent for Removal)(Sipes, Jade) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/22/2022 to lock down PDF) (cwl, ). Modified on 7/22/2022to remove "LLC" from filer & add "Inc" (cwl, ).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order COMPLAINT against Auction.com, Inc., First American Data Tree, LLC, First American Financial Corporation, filed by Martha McKenzie, Dan McKenzie. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cwl, )
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ANSWER to Complaint by Auction.com, Inc. (NO pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cwl, )
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Auction.com, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (NO pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order JOINDER (Consent to Removal) re #1 Notice of Removal, by First American Data Tree, LLC, First American Financial Corporation. (NO pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cwl, )
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ANSWER to Complaint by First American Data Tree, LLC, First American Financial Corporation. (NO pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenzie et al v. Auction.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha McKenzie
Represented By: Christina Diane Crow
Represented By: Lynn Wilson Jinks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan McKenzie
Represented By: Christina Diane Crow
Represented By: Lynn Wilson Jinks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auction.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jade Eleanor Sipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Data Tree, LLC
Represented By: Gerald Carl Swann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Financial Corporation
Represented By: Gerald Carl Swann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?