Billingsley v. Spiller Furniture (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Jerry Donald Billingsley
Defendant: Spiller Furniture
Case Number: 2:2022cv00489
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: W Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OBJECTION to #5 Findings & Recommendations by Jerry Donald Billingsley. (am, )
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the undersigned RECOMMENDS this case be DISMISSED without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 10/11/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 9/27/2022. (am, )
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Doc. No. #3 .) Although Plaintiff provided the Court with a prison account statement from the inmate account clerk, the provided statement does not show the average monthly balance in and average monthly deposits to his prison account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his Complaint. (See id. at 2.) Instead, the statement shows Plaintiff's account information from December 2021 through May 2022, but his Complaint was not filed until August 2022. (See Doc. No. #1 .) Accordingly, it is ORDERED that, by 9/14/2022, Plaintiff must supplement his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with a new, updated prison account statement from the inmate account clerk showing the average monthly balance in and average monthly deposits to his prison account from May 2022 through August 2022. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plaintiff is detained. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 8/31/2022. Copy mailed to inmate account clerk as directed.(dmn, )
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jerry Donald Billingsley. (am, )
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 8/30/2022, Plf must either pay the $52.00 administrative fee and $350.00 filing fee or file an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with a prison account statement from the inmate account clerk showing the average monthly balance in and average monthly deposits to his prison account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this Complaint; the Clerk is DIRECTED to (1) provide Plf with an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and (2) provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plf is detained. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 8/16/2022. (bes, )
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Spiller Furniture, filed by Jerry Donald Billingsley. (NO IFP; NO FILING FEE)(bll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billingsley v. Spiller Furniture (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Donald Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spiller Furniture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?