Empirian Health, LLC v. Specialty RX, Inc.
Plaintiff: Empirian Health, LLC
Defendant: Specialty RX, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00639
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: This case is before the court on the question whether it has jurisdiction on the basis of removal jurisdiction, 28 U.S.C. 1441(a), and diversity of citizenship, 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). During a conference call held with the parties on 12/2/2022, the parties indicated that they are not sure of all States in which plaintiff Empirian Health LLC is a citizen because the parties have not yet determined the identity of all members of the LLC and its subsidiary entities. They both requested that the court allow jurisdictional discovery to determine the citizenship of all members. The court will grant the request. Accordingly, and based on the representations made on the record on 12/2/2022, it is ORDERED that: (1) The parties shall have a period of 60 days, that is, until 2/3/2023, to conduct limited discovery to determine the names and citizenship of each member of plaintiff Empirian Health, LLC. (2) By 2/8/2023, defendant Specialty RX, Inc., shall file an amended notice of removal. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/5/2022. (dmn, )
December 2, 2022 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson: Telephone Conference held on 12/2/2022 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Blanton Callen.) (kcf, )
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: setting a Telephone Conference call for 12/2/2022 @ 8:15 AM before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/28/2022. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (Furnished: Calendar & AG)(am, )
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 Response re #8 Order of Allegation of Citizenship of Plaintiff Empirian Health, LLC filed by Specialty RX, Inc.. (Butler, Michael) Modified on 11/22/2022 to clarify text (am, ).
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is therefore the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the removing defendant has until 11/21/2022, to amend the notice of removal to allege jurisdiction sufficiently, see 28 U.S.C. 1653; otherwise this lawsuit shall be remanded to state court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/10/2022. (am, )
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT: UNREDACTED Copy of COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed in response to #6 Order. (Attachments: #1 Copy of #6 Order, #2 Cover Letter)(dmn, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2022: #3 Exhibit A) (dmn, ). Modified on 11/7/2022 to include Exhibit A that was omitted when docketed due to docketing error. (dmn, )
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: It is ORDERED that, by 11/7/2022, defendant shall file an unredacted copy of the complaint under seal. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/2/2022. (dmn, )
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 Case Assigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge. (am, )
October 31, 2022 NOTICE of Filing Removal to State Court by Specialty RX, Inc. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )
October 31, 2022 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Specialty RX, Inc., filed by Empirian Health, LLC. (NO PDF- See doc #1 )(am, )
October 31, 2022 Filing 4 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Transfer Venue filed by Specialty RX, Inc.. (Butler, Michael)
October 31, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Venue by Specialty RX, Inc.. (Butler, Michael). Added MOTION to Transfer Venue on 11/1/2022 (am, ).
October 31, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Specialty RX, Inc.. (Butler, Michael)
October 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Specialty RX, Inc. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number CV-2022-901224. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3313538) , filed by Specialty RX, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint filed in the Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, #3 Exhibit 2 - Circuit Court file for Montgomery County, Alabama, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Service on Specialty, #5 Exhibit 4 - New Jersey Secretary of State Business entity information)(Butler, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empirian Health, LLC v. Specialty RX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empirian Health, LLC
Represented By: James Ethan McDaniel
Represented By: Nicolas Howard Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty RX, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Warren Butler
Represented By: Ann Campbell Potter Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?