Eslick et al v. Culling et al
Plaintiff: Esther Eslick and Charles Eslick
Defendant: Gale Culling, AAA Insurance Company, Inc. and North Star Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00677
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by North Star Mutual Insurance Company. (Hinton, Jack) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2023: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (bes, ).
January 18, 2023 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Warren, James)
January 6, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Daniel Toppen on behalf of Gale Culling (Toppen, Mark)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in Order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/18/2023. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/28/2022. (bes, )
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to North Star Mutual Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
December 6, 2022 ***PURSUANT TO THE #6 NOTICE - Attorney Jack Buster Hinton, Jr for North Star Mutual Insurance Company added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Consent to #1 Removal by North Star Mutual Insurance Company (Hinton, Jack) Modified on 12/7/2022 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Gale Culling Conflict Disclosure Statement (Tuley, Jay)
November 22, 2022 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gale Culling re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #5 for PDF) (bes, )
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Gale Culling; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge. (bes, )
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gale Culling.(Tuley, Jay)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gale Culling from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 03-cv-22-901311.00 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3324495) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Inspection Notice Letter, #3 Exhibit Declarations Page (redacted))(Tuley, Jay) Modified on 11/21/2022 to clarify docket text (bes, ).
November 21, 2022 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against AAA Insurance Company, Inc., Gale Culling, North Star Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Esther Eslick, Charles Eslick. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -1 for PDF)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eslick et al v. Culling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Eslick
Represented By: James Barton Warren
Represented By: Morris Herbert Lilienthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Eslick
Represented By: James Barton Warren
Represented By: Morris Herbert Lilienthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gale Culling
Represented By: Jay Stewart Tuley
Represented By: Mark Daniel Toppen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack Buster Hinton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?