Hensley v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Jason K. Hensley
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Wilcotte Rahming, Corizon, LLC, John Q. Hamm, Dr. MacAuthor and YesCare Corp.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00227
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER:By June 23, 2023, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies identified in this Order, as further set out in order. The amended complaint filed in response to this Order will supersede all previous complaints. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a copy of the prisoner 1983 form and this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/9/2023.(form mailed as directed) (hrr, )
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Amended Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, John Q. Hamm, Dr. MacAuthor, Wilcotte Rahming, Yes Care, filed by Jason K. Hensley.(bes, )
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 6/7/2023, Plf must file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file 1983 complaints; it is ORDERED that the #4 Motion to Add a Dft is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/24/2023. (bes, )
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Alex City WR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/24/2023. (Furn: Cashier) (bes, )
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jason K. Hensley. (bes, )
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to add Dft by Jason K. Hensley. (bes, )
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 5/10/2023, Plf must file a prison account statement from the inmate account clerk showing the average monthly balance and average monthly deposits in his prison account for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this Complaint; the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plf is incarcerated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/26/2023. (Copy mailed to Account Clerk at ADOC WR ALEX CITY)(bes, )
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED to US Magistrate Judge: #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jason K. Hensley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(hrr, ) Modified on 4/24/2023 to correct event from Appeal IFP to app IFP (bes, ).
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Corizon, LLC, John Q. Hamm, Dr. MacAuthor, Wilcotte Rahming, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., filed by Jason K. Hensley. (Attachments: #1 Medical Statement)(hrr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason K. Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilcotte Rahming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Q. Hamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. MacAuthor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YesCare Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?