Sims v. Starr et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Allan D. Sims, Jr.
Defendant: Laura Starr, Deputy McCoulough, Judge Stevens, Muscogee County Jail, Deputy Neutron, 17th Judicial Circuit Court System and Muscogee County Georgia
Case Number: 2:2024cv00312
Filed: May 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Chad W Bryan
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plf thus is ORDERED to show cause no later than June 13, 2024 as to why this action should not be dismissed or, alternatively, transferred to the Middle District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 5/30/2024. (mailed reg & CMRRR to pro se PLF)(BES)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE: it is ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 USC 636, this case is REFERRED to the US Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/29/2024. (BES)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of the pro se party to Participate in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Allan D. Sims, Jr. (BES)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INFORMATION of the pro se party for Participation in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Allan D. Sims, Jr. (BES)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Allan D. Sims, Jr. (BES)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Allan D. Sims, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(BES)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against 17th Judicial Circuit Court System, Deputy McCoulough, Muscogee County Georgia, Muscogee County Jail, Deputy Neutron, Laura Starr, Judge Stevens, filed by Allan D. Sims, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(BES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Starr et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan D. Sims, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy McCoulough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muscogee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Neutron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 17th Judicial Circuit Court System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muscogee County Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?