Infinity Investments, LLC et al v. AAA Queen Bee Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Infinity Investments, LLC and Jabari Mosley
Defendant: Pamela Sterrett and AAA Queen Bee Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00377
Filed: July 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 7 U.S.C. ยง 25 Fraud - Commodities Leverage Contracts
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with costs taxed as paid. All pending deadlines are terminated. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 7/16/2024. (BES)
July 16, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Infinity Investments, LLC, Jabari Mosley. (Edge, Harry)
July 2, 2024 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 1332, this Court has jurisdiction over actions between "citizens of different States." Upon a review of the Complaint (doc. #1 ), Plaintiffs and Defendant Pamela Sterrett are alleged to be citizens of the State of Alabama. Therefore, it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE on or by 7/16/24 why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 7/2/2024. (BES)
July 2, 2024 Filing 4 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. as Presiding Judge; Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case. (BES)
July 1, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel re service material as to #1 Complaint. (LAB)
July 1, 2024 Filing 2 Case Assigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as presider and Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate as referral. (LAB)
July 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AAA Queen Bee Construction, Inc., Pamela Sterrett ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BALMDC-3664037.), filed by Infinity Investments, LLC and Jabari Mosley. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 9/30/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hiatt, Ethan) (Attachment 1 replaced and modified text on 7/1/2024) (LAB)
July 1, 2024 ***Attorney Harry Arthur Edge, III for Infinity Investments, LLC and Jabari Mosley added. (not added when Atty opened) (LAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infinity Investments, LLC et al v. AAA Queen Bee Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infinity Investments, LLC
Represented By: Ethan Hiatt
Represented By: Harry Arthur Edge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabari Mosley
Represented By: Ethan Hiatt
Represented By: Harry Arthur Edge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Queen Bee Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?