Doe v. The Alabama Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Gwendolyn Givens, Chadwick Crabtree, Jeremy Pelzer, Deborah Toney, Artchie Giddy, Keith Roach, The Alabama Department of Corrections, William Streeter, Denice McKenzie, Ernest Stirling, Christopher Gordy, John Hutton, Maurice Gipson, FNU Reece, Kilby CO John Doe, Ronald Carter, Christopher Webster, Teresa Domec and Scotty Shaffer
Case Number: 2:2024cv00455
Filed: July 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Chad W Bryan
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Limited Discovery by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed subpoena for limited discovery) (Menefee, Andrew) Modified on text 9/24/2024 (CWL).
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Ronald Carter, Chadwick Crabtree, Teresa Domec, Artchie Giddy, Maurice Gipson, Gwendolyn Givens, Christopher Gordy, John Hutton, Denice McKenzie, Jeremy Pelzer, FNU Reece, Keith Roach, Scotty Shaffer, Ernest Stirling, William Streeter, The Alabama Department of Corrections, Deborah Toney, Christopher Webster. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (CWL)
September 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Proposed Summons for all Defendants (Menefee, Andrew)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order to Show to Cause filed by John Doe. (Menefee, Andrew) Modified on 9/10/2024 (CWL).
September 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Alabama Department of Corrections, Gwendolyn Givens, Artchie Giddy, Keith Roach, Deborah Toney, Chadwick Crabtree, William Streeter, Denice McKenzie, Jeremy Pelzer, Ernest Stirling, Christopher Gordy, John Hutton, Ronald Carter, Christopher Webster, Teresa Domec, Maurice Gipson, Kilby CO John Doe, FNU Reece, Scotty Shaffer, filed by John Doe. (Menefee, Andrew) Modified on 9/9/2024 (CWL).
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: the Court holds the Plaintiff's motion (doc. #6 ) in ABEYANCE until such time that the Defendants may be able to provide a response to the Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/4/2024. (CWL)
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT (Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement) re #7 Order. (CWL)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before September 10, 2024, the Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why he failed to file, under seal, an unredacted conflict disclosure statement disclosing his full name in accordance with the Court's #7 Order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/3/2024. (CWL)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before August 30, 2024, the Plaintiff shall file under seal an unredacted conflict disclosure statement setting forth his full name. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to file and maintain the unredacted conflict disclosure statement under seal until further order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/23/2024. (CWL)
August 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Response to Order Motion for Plaintiff to Proceed Pseudonymously filed by John Doe. (Menefee, Andrew)
August 16, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym by John Doe. (no pdf - see #6 ) (CWL)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 8/16/2024, the Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint disclosing his full legal name or a motion to proceed under a fictitious name with appropriate briefing, as further set out in Order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/2/2024. (AM)
July 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to John Doe. Corporate Disclosures due by 8/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(CWL)
July 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel regarding service material (CWL)
July 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan as referral Judge. (CWL)
July 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages with JURY DEMAND against The Alabama Department of Corrections, Gwendolyn Givens, Shafer, Artchie Giddy, Keith Roach, Deborah Toney, Chadwick Crabtree, William Streeter, Denice McKenzie, Jeremy Pelzer ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AALMDC-3681220.), filed by John Doe. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/28/2024. (Menefee, Andrew) Modified text on 7/30/2024 (CWL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. The Alabama Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chadwick Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Pelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artchie Giddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Streeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denice McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Gordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilby CO John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Domec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotty Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Andrew Dill Menefee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?