Gemstone Foods, LLC v. Tecta America-Construction Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gemstone Foods, LLC
Defendant: Tecta America-Construction Services, LLC and Americold Logistics, LLC
Cross-Complainant: Americold Logistics, LLC
Cross-Defendant: Tecta America-Construction Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2025cv00072
Filed: January 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Form to Decline Consent to the U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Americold Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 General Order)(AM)
March 20, 2025 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Americold Logistics, LLC. (Long, Felicia)
March 20, 2025 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Tecta America-Construction Services, LLC by Americold Logistics, LLC. (Long, Felicia)
February 27, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gemstone Foods, LLC. Americold Logistics, LLC served on 2/27/2025, answer due 3/20/2025. (Heilman, Michael)
February 11, 2025 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gemstone Foods, LLC. Americold Logistics, LLC served on 2/5/2025, answer due 2/26/2025. (Heilman, Michael)
January 31, 2025 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement re: #6 Notice of Deficiency by Gemstone Foods, LLC. (Heilman, Michael) Modified on 2/3/2025 to add linkage & clarify text (AM).
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: For good cause, Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Doc. No. #7 ) for Michael A. Heilman is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 1/30/2025. (HRR)
January 29, 2025 Filing 7 Motion for Michael A. Heilman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 7024.) by Gemstone Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Receipt)(HRR)
January 27, 2025 Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Gemstone Foods, LLC. Corporate Disclosures due by 2/6/2025. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(CWL)
January 27, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel - Pro Hac Vice Admission re Michael A. Heilman (CWL)
January 27, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Form to Decline Consent to the U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Gemstone Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 General Order)(CWL)
January 27, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Americold Logistics, LLC, Tecta America-Construction Services, LLC. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (CWL)
January 27, 2025 Filing 2 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams. (CWL)
January 24, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Americold Logistics, LLC, Tecta America-Construction Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AALMDC-3782420.), filed by Gemstone Foods, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 4/24/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Tecta), #3 Summons (Americold)) (Heilman, Michael) Modified text on 1/27/2025 (CWL). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/28/2025) (HRR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gemstone Foods, LLC v. Tecta America-Construction Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gemstone Foods, LLC
Represented By: Michael Heilman
Represented By: Michael Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tecta America-Construction Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americold Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Felicia Abernathy Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-complainant: Americold Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Felicia Abernathy Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Tecta America-Construction Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?