Ray et al v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: Meredith Chadwick Ray and Phillip Ray
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv00175
Filed: February 27, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Chambers
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2012 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file promptly their stipulation and to include in their stipulation a specification of any numbered medical exhibits which are not included and to which objections are still asserted. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/3/12. (djy, )
December 23, 2011 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that as to the Plaintiffs' objections to the Defendant's counter designations to the deposition of Toynia Stewart, it is ORDERED that said objections are SUSTAINED in part and OVERRULED in part, as set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/23/2011. (cc, )
December 14, 2011 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that (1) the defendant's 177 Objections are SUSTAINED as to plaintiff's exhibits 27, 84-90, 1011, 1013, 1014, and 1019; (2) the court will reserve judgment as to the rest of the defendant's objections. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/14/11. (djy, )
December 13, 2011 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 184 Motion for leave to file exhibits under Seal. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/13/11. (djy, )
June 1, 2011 153 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 123 motion for summary judgment, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/1/11. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Chadwick Ray
Represented By: David Michael Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Ray
Represented By: David Michael Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Donald Alan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?