Greyhound Lines, Inc. v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.

Plaintiff: Greyhound Lines, Inc.
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00516
Filed: June 30, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2009 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) The 250 costs taxed against Greyhound and infavor of Goodyear are satisfied; and (2) the 246 Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/10/2009. (cb, )
March 24, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: (1) The 109 Motion for Oral Argument is DENIED; and (2) The 87 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/24/2009. (cb, )
October 28, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 18 Order and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; and that the 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute or, in the Alternative, Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/28/2008. (cb, )
October 10, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that counsel for the parties are directed to confer either in person or by telephone on or before 10/20/08 to schedule the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition(s) of plaintiff's corporate representatives and Leslie Croswell, with such depositions to held no later than 11/16/08 as further set out; RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that defendant's 17 Motion to Dismiss for failure to prosecute, or, in the alternative, Motion for Sanctions be DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to file the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and to serve a copy on the parties to this action. Objections to R&R due by 10/23/2008. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 10/10/2008. (cb, ) Modified on 10/10/2008 to modify judge association(cb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greyhound Lines, Inc. v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greyhound Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Roy C Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?