Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Petry Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: North Lake Condo Club Association, Inc., Alfred G. Galdi, Petry Construction, Inc., Daniel F. Petry, Jim Estes, Jeff Gleason, Jeff Kennedy, Tim McNair and Gary Parisher
Counter_claimant: Alfred G. Galdi, Daniel F. Petry and Petry Construction, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv00572
Filed: July 17, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: O Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: O
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court construes the 109 Joint Stipulation and Motion of All Parties for Entry of Consent Judgment, Opinion and Order as a Joint Motion to Dismiss. So construed, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/7/2010. (dmn)
April 29, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Proposed Consent Order attached by the parties to their joint stipulation of dismissal (see Doc. 109 -2). ORDERED that a Status Conference is set for 5/7/2010 at 09:00 AM by conference call arranged by counsel for Plaintiff before Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller. Counsel should be prepared to discuss their settlement and the details of their proposed consent order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/29/2010. Copies furnished to YG, HC, KG. (dmn)
March 16, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 66 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, 75 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 85 Objection and Motion to Strike Defendants' Evidentiary Submission of Defendants and 88 Motion for Leave to Respond to Defendants' Reply Brief. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/16/2010. (cc, )
February 8, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has been notified by the parties that the dispute in this case has been resolved. It is hereby ORDERED: 1) That trial of this case set for 2/22/2010 is continued generally; and 2) That the parties file a joint stipulation of dismissal on or before 3/7/2010. The parties shall attach to that filing any proposed consent order they wish the Court to enter. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/8/2010. Copies furnished to YG, HC, KG. (dmn)
February 3, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties having informed this Court that they have reached a settlement and require the issuance of a consent order, it is hereby ORDERED that a Status Conference is set for 2/5/2010 at 10:30 AM by conference call before Hon. Chief Judge Ma rk E. Fuller. The parties are DIRECTED to JOINTLY prepare a proposed consent order. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to email the proposed consent order to be received no later than 5:00 p.m. on 2/4/2010. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/3/2010. Copies furnished to YG, HC, KG. (dmn)
January 12, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 97 Motion to Stay. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/12/2010. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Petry Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Lake Condo Club Association, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Edmund Baddley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred G. Galdi
Represented By: John M Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petry Construction, Inc.
Represented By: John M Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel F. Petry
Represented By: John M Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Estes
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Gleason
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Kennedy
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim McNair
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Parisher
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Roger Stephen Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Alfred G. Galdi
Represented By: John M Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Daniel F. Petry
Represented By: Ramsey A Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Petry Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Ramsey A Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Roger Stephen Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?