Gates v. Lee County et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Reginald S. Gates
Defendant: Lee County, Russell County, Auburn Police, Phenix City Police, Lee County Sheriff's Department, Russell County Sheriff's Department, Mr. Cobb, Mr. Lylen, Mr. Jones, Mrs. Cooper and Mr. Hill
Case Number: 3:2009cv00480
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 9/21/2009. (cc, )
August 17, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 9/8/09 plaintiff shall file a response to defendants' 19 written report as further set out. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 8/17/09. (sl, )
June 8, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's claims regarding visitation and verbal threats be DISMISSED be with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that Plaintiff's claims r egarding leftover food be DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); that Plaintiff's claims against Lee County, Alabama, be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that Plaintiff's cl aims against Defendants Lyale, Hill, Jones, Cooper, Sheriff Jones, and Welcher be DISMISSED under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that Defendants Lee County, Alabama, Mr. Lyale, Mr. Hill, Mr. Jones, Mrs. Cooper,Sheriff Jones, and Welcher be DISMIS SED as parties to the complaint; that this complaint with respect to Plaintiff's allegations of inadequate medical care and excessive force against Defendants McFarland and Cobb be referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 6/22/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 6/8/2009. (cc, )
May 27, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Lee County Detention Center. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 5/27/09. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gates v. Lee County et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald S. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auburn Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix City Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Lylen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?