Jackson v. Mead Westvaco

Plaintiff: Harry Lee Jackson
Defendant: Mead Westvaco
Case Number: 3:2009cv00695
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) ADOPTING 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Mag Judge; (2) def's 27 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; and (3) this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/12/10. (djy, )
December 23, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment; OVERRULING plf's 24 objections; further ORDERING that the 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Mag Judge is ADOPTED; further ORDERING that this case is hereby REFERRED back to the Mag Judge for appropriate action or recommendation on all pretrial matters. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/23/09. (djy, )
December 8, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; the Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Plf's 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment, be DENIED; Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 12/8/2009. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Mead Westvaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Lee Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Westvaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?