Hendry v. Lee County Detention Center (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: William Bryan Hendry
Defendant: Lee County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2010cv00380
Filed: May 3, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 6 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge; dismisisng Plaintiff's complaint with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 6/10/2010. (br, )
May 7, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before May 21, 2010 as further set out in the order; plaintiff shall use the court's 1983 form; Clerk is directed to furnish Plaintiff with the correct form. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/7/2010. 1983 form sent to plaintiff with this order. (br, )
May 6, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Lee County Detention Center. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/6/2010. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendry v. Lee County Detention Center (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bryan Hendry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?