Perry v. Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tammy Perry
Defendant: Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00455
Filed: May 24, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Russell
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 31 Second MOTION to Intervene filed by Sedgwick CMS, MeadWestvaco Coated Board. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cc, )
June 22, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 7 MOTION to Amend Complaint; further ORDERING that Perry shall file her amended complaint by no later than 6/25/2010, as further set out in order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/22/10. (djy, )
June 15, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 MOTION to Substitute; to the extent that plf seeks to file the motion for Leave to amend complaint, it is GRANTED and that document shall be deemed a pending motion; further ORDERING that defendants shall have until 6/22/2010 to sub mit any brief in opposition to the 7 motion for leave to amend complaint; ORDERING that the 7 motion for leave to file the motion for remand is DENIED as premature, as further set out in order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/15/10. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Perry
Represented By: Dana Posey Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Ernest Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?