Huguley v. Lockhart et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Corey Jermaine Huguley
Defendant: Sid Lockhart, Clay Stewart, Lisa Burdette, Victoria Jackson, Officer Lett and Jessia Morgan
Case Number: 3:2010cv00803
Filed: September 23, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION that the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 42 beand is hereby ADOPTED and that: 1. Defendants Lockhart's, Stewart's, and Morgan's motions for summary judgment 31 , 32 are GRANTED as further set out; 2. This case against Defendants Lockhart, Stewart, and Morgan are DISMISSED with prejudice as further set out; 3. Defendant Lett's motion for summary judgment 26 is GRANTED and this case against him is DISMISSED with prejudice; 4. Judgment is ENTERED in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff; and 5. Costs are TAXED against Plaintiff for which execution may issue. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 8/7/2013. (jg, )
January 31, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that on or before February 22, 2011 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' answers and written reports as further set out. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 1/31/2011. (jg, )
December 15, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION; that the 9 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: 1. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Burdette and Jackson are DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(I); 2. Defendants Burdette and Jackson are DISMISSED as parties to the complaint; and 3. This case with respect to the remaining defendants is REFERRED back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 12/15/2010. (jg, )
September 27, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $1.65 be paid on or before October 18, 2010; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/27/2010. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huguley v. Lockhart et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Jermaine Huguley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Burdette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessia Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?