Johnston v. U-Haul International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tammy Johnston
Defendant: David Walker, Katherine Miller, U-Haul International, Inc., Sovran Holdings, Inc. and Eberly Transportation
Cross_claimant: Katherine Miller
Cross_defendant: Sovran Holdings, Inc., U-Haul International, Inc., David Walker and Eberly Transportation
Case Number: 3:2011cv00981
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The 116 consent motion to substitute parties is granted; (2) Sovran Holdings, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice; (3) Sovran Acquisition Limited Partnershipd d/b/a Uncle Bob's Self Storage is substituted for Sovran Holdings, Inc. as a defendant; (4) Plaintiff is to file an amended complaint, that meets the requirements of this order, by no later than January 24, 2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/17/13. (scn, )
July 6, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 71 motion to extend time is denied. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/6/2012. (cc, )
January 6, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that defendant Eberly Transportation, d/b/a Two Men and a Truck, and the claims against it, are dismissed without prejudice. The court assumes that defendant Eberly Transportation, d/b/a Tw o Men and a Truck, has no objection to the dismissal; however, if it does, it must file the objection within seven days from the date of this judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to FRCP. Eberly Transportation, d/b/a Two Men and a Truck, is terminated as a main defendant. Said party is still this case as a crossclaim defendant. This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/6/2012. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. U-Haul International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Walker
Represented By: R. Austin Huffaker, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Charles Ward, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Miller
Represented By: Alex Lafayette Holtsford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U-Haul International, Inc.
Represented By: Haley Andrews Cox
Represented By: Joel Chandler Bailey, II
Represented By: Tenley Elizabeth Armstrong
Represented By: John Banks Sewell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sovran Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Tenley Elizabeth Armstrong
Represented By: Joel Chandler Bailey, II
Represented By: Haley Andrews Cox
Represented By: John Banks Sewell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eberly Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Katherine Miller
Represented By: Alex Lafayette Holtsford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Sovran Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Tenley Elizabeth Armstrong
Represented By: Joel Chandler Bailey, II
Represented By: Haley Andrews Cox
Represented By: John Banks Sewell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: U-Haul International, Inc.
Represented By: Tenley Elizabeth Armstrong
Represented By: Joel Chandler Bailey, II
Represented By: Haley Andrews Cox
Represented By: John Banks Sewell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: David Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Eberly Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Johnston
Represented By: William I Whorton
Represented By: Edward Alexander Piasta
Represented By: Peter A Law
Represented By: E Michael Moran
Represented By: William Gay Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?