Patterson v. Clark et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Christopher Lamar Patterson
Defendant: Sheriff Clark, Sheriff Wayne, Mayor of Macon County and Macon County Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2012cv00077
Filed: January 26, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION: it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 43 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: 1) The dfts' 27 motion to dismiss is GRANTED to the extent the dfts seek dismissal of this case due to the pl f's failure to properly exhaust an administrative remedy available to him at the Macon County Detention Center prior to filing this federal civil action; 2) This case is dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 42 USC § 1997e(a) for the plf's failure to properly exhaust an administrative remedy previously available to him at the Macon County Detention Center; 3) No costs are taxed herein. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/30/2015. (wcl, )
September 18, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION that the 31 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: 1. The plaintiff's claims against a Macon County commissioner and the Mayor of Macon County are dismissed with prejudice prior to service o f process pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(I). 2. The aforementioned defendants are dismissed as defendants in this cause of action. 3. This case, with respect to the allegations set forth against defendants Clark and Wayne, are referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/18/2012. (jg, )
March 22, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the plaintiff be GRANTED an extension until 4/5/2012 to pay the remaining $20.47 of the initial partial filing fee. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/22/12. (djy, )
February 21, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before March 5, 2012 the plaintiff shall show cause why he has failed to pay the initial partial filing fee in compliance with the directives of the order entered on January 27, 2012 3 . Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/21/2012. (jg, )
January 27, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $40.47 be paid on or before February 17, 2012; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Ventress Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/27/2012. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Clark et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor of Macon County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macon County Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lamar Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?